MD SB41 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB782

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the minimum age, from 16 years to 12 years, at which a minor has the same capacity as an adult to consent to consultation, diagnosis, and certain treatment of a mental or emotional disorder by a health care provider or clinic; and providing that a health care provider may decide to provide certain information to a certain parent, guardian, or custodian under certain provisions of law unless the health care provider believes that the disclosure will lead to harm to the minor or deter the minor from seeking care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment 383326/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Favorable Adopted (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-02-19SenateThird Reading Passed (31-16)
2021-02-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-02-17SenateFloor Amendment {383326/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (14-33)
2021-02-17SenateFavorable Adopted (32-15)
2021-02-16SenateMotion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Carozza) Adopted
2021-02-16SenateFavorable
2021-02-10SenateMotion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Carozza) Adopted
2021-02-10SenateFavorable
2021-02-09SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-01-15SenateHearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2020-09-24SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB132 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
HB782 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback