MD HB132 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the minimum age, from 16 years to 12 years, at which a minor has the same capacity as an adult to consent to consultation, diagnosis, and certain treatment of a mental or emotional disorder by a health care provider or clinic; and providing that a health care provider may decide to provide certain information to a certain parent, guardian, or custodian under certain provisions of law unless the health care provider believes the disclosure will lead to harm to the minor or deter the minor from seeking care.
Title
Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Floor Amendment 153628/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 93 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - Floor Amendment 223129/1 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (Y: 45 N: 90 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - Floor Amendment 413522/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 48 N: 86 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - Floor Amendment 953029/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (Y: 49 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - Floor Amendment 413628/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 87 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - Floor Amendment 153628/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 93 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - Floor Amendment 223129/1 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (Y: 45 N: 90 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - Floor Amendment 413522/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 48 N: 86 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - Floor Amendment 953029/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (Y: 49 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - Floor Amendment 413628/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 87 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Rejected |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-44) |
2021-04-08 | House | Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | Floor Amendment {153628/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (42-93) |
2021-04-07 | House | Floor Amendment {223129/1 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (45-90) |
2021-04-07 | House | Floor Amendment {413522/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (48-86) |
2021-04-07 | House | Floor Amendment {953029/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (49-87) |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | Floor Amendment {953029/1 (Delegate Rose) |
2021-04-07 | House | Floor Amendment {413628/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (44-87) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-06 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-09-22 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB41 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 743
Subjects
Age
Communications
Disclosure
Drugs
Health
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Public Health
Safety
Communications
Disclosure
Drugs
Health
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Public Health
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |