MD SB392 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain annual report by the State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy to identify certain information for crimes of violence; and requiring the Commission to conspicuously post the required information to be included in the report in a data dashboard on its public website.
Title
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Annual Report and Data Dashboard (The Judicial Transparency Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Committee Amendment #3 Adopted (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Committee Amendment #3 Adopted (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment #3 Adopted (28-17) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee Amendments #1 and #2 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {703421/1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB412 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Forms
Judges
Jurisdiction
Penalties and Sentences
Pleas
Reports
Violence
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Forms
Judges
Jurisdiction
Penalties and Sentences
Pleas
Reports
Violence
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 14 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |