MD SB39 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a tax collector may not assess interest on specified unpaid taxes if the tax collector does not assess a penalty for failure to pay the tax; etc.
Title
Back Taxes - No Penalty, No Interest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Comptroller
Franchise Tax
Income Tax
Inheritance Tax
Interest
Penalties and Sentences
Registers of Wills
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Comptroller
Franchise Tax
Income Tax
Inheritance Tax
Interest
Penalties and Sentences
Registers of Wills
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous