MD SB380 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to conduct a study to assess the need in the State for short-term medical insurance offered by nonadmitted insurers; establishing specified requirements for the study; requiring the Administration to solicit input from specified persons in conducting the study; requiring the Administration to submit a specified report to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 224
2017-03-29SenatePassed Enrolled
2017-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-03-29SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2017-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
2017-03-24HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-24HouseFavorable with Amendments {776584/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-24HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2017-03-23HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-15HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2017-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {727476/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2017-02-08SenateHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-26SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0380&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0380f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0380t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0380e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_224_sb0380e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0380_72747601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0380_77658401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0380.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0380_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0380_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0380,s-0559&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0380,h-0946&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0380,s-0905&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback