MD SB375 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB198
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Restricting a person that sells a neonicotinoid pesticide under certain provisions of law to selling a neonicotinoid pesticide only to a certain certified applicator or farmer; and requiring a person selling a neonicotinoid pesticide to store each neonicotinoid pesticide in a manner that is inaccessible to customers without the assistance from the person or an employee of the person.
Title
Agriculture – Neonicotinoid Pesticides – Sale and Storage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 627 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-28) |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {534332/1 Adopted |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB208 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
SB198 (Carry Over) 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
SB198 (Carry Over) 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 5 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5 | 2A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5 | 2A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |