MD HB208 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Restricting a person that sells a neonicotinoid pesticide under certain provisions of law to selling a neonicotinoid pesticide only to a certain certified applicator or farmer; and requiring a person selling a neonicotinoid pesticide to store each neonicotinoid pesticide in a manner that is inaccessible to customers without the assistance from the person or an employee of the person.
Title
Agriculture – Neonicotinoid Pesticides – Sale and Storage
Sponsors
Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-22) |
2021-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {690413/1 Adopted |
2021-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-04 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB375 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 627
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 5 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5 | 2A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5 | 2A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |