MD SB198 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from selling, on or after January 1, 2018, a neonicotinoid pesticide unless the person also sells a restricted use pesticide; prohibiting a person from using a neonicotinoid pesticide on or after January 1, 2018, unless the person is a certified applicator or a person working under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Agriculture to incorporate pollinator habitat expansion and enhancement practices into the State's Managed Pollinator Protection Plan; requiring a specified report; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-12) (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-39) (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Hornberger) {893329/1 Rejected (50-86) (Y: 50 N: 86 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Jennings) {233124/1 Rejected (18-27) (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-28SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
2016-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2016-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (34-12)
2016-04-09SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2016-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (98-39)
2016-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-07HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Hornberger) {893329/1 Rejected (50-86)
2016-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {460311/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2016-03-30HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-22HouseHearing cancelled
2016-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-10HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2016-03-09SenateThird Reading Passed (32-14)
2016-03-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-07SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {613029/1 Adopted
2016-03-07SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Conway) {253526/2 Adopted
2016-03-04SenateSpecial Order until 3/7 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
2016-03-04SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Hough) {973420/1 Adopted
2016-03-04SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {443529/1 Adopted
2016-03-04SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {773926/2 Adopted
2016-03-04SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {233124/1 Rejected (18-27)
2016-03-04SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Conway) {673623/1 Adopted
2016-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2016-03-04SenateSpecial Order until later today (President) Adopted
2016-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments
2016-03-02SenateSpecial Order until 3/4 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
2016-03-02SenateFavorable with Amendments
2016-03-02SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
2016-03-02SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2016-03-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {214736/1
2016-03-01SenateLaid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
2016-03-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {214736/1
2016-02-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-02-16SenateHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-22SenateHearing cancelled
2016-02-09SenateHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-20SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0198?ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0198f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0198t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0198e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_661_sb0198e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0198_21473601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0198_23312401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0198_44352901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0198_67362301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0198_77392602.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0198_97342001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0198_25352602.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0198_61302901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0198_46031101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0198_89332901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0198.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0198_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0198_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0198,s-0408&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0198,s-0448&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0198,h-1180&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0198,h-1054&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0198,s-1194&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback