MD SB364 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Nancy Grasmick Teacher Award in the Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment Program; requiring the Office to assist in the repayment of specified loans owed by specified public school teachers in the State who teach specified subjects or teach in specified schools in Maryland for a specified period of time; providing that a recipient of the Award shall be known as a Nancy Grasmick Teacher Scholar; etc.
Title
Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Nancy Grasmick Teacher Scholars
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (125-10) | |
2012-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-04-04 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2012-03-27 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments 234832/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:20 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-07 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-30 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Gaming
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Loans
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Teachers
Gaming
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Loans
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Teachers