MD SB36 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to execute an electronic will or remotely witnessed will without a notary public if the supervising attorney creates a certified will that contains a certain form attached or annexed to the will; prohibiting a supervising attorney from being a witness to an electronic will or remotely witnessed will if the will is executed without a notary public; and authorizing a notary public located in the State to perform a notarial act using communication technology for a remotely located individual for a trust instrument.
Title
Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-0) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB576 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Subjects
Attorneys
Certifications
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Emergency Bills
Estates and Trusts
Forms
Notaries Public
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Witnesses
Certifications
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Emergency Bills
Estates and Trusts
Forms
Notaries Public
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 4 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 18 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |