MD SB36 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from 15 years to 25 years, the amount of time that an inmate who has been sentenced to life imprisonment after being convicted of a crime committed on or after October 1, 2020, must serve before becoming eligible for parole consideration.
Title
Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Life Imprisonment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 7 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0036?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0036f.pdf |