MD SB354 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing refillable container permits for draft beer in Charles County and Queen Anne's County; authorizing the Charles County Board of License Commissioners and the Queen Anne's County Board of License Commissioners to issue the permits to holders of specified licenses under specified circumstances and conditions; specifying that the permit authorizes the permit holders to sell draft beer for consumption off the licensed premises in a refillable container under specified circumstances and conditions; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {313197/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Churches
Community Facilities and Services
Fees
Hotels and Motels
Labeling
Libraries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Private Schools
Public Schools
Queen Anne's County
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Churches
Community Facilities and Services
Fees
Hotels and Motels
Labeling
Libraries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Private Schools
Public Schools
Queen Anne's County
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations