MD SB324 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Nonpublic Student Bus Transportation to collect information from each local board of education regarding nonpublic school student busing programs, other than those for the transportation of students in special education, and make recommendations as to how the State may support a reduction in the use of passenger vehicles for the transportation of nonpublic school students; requiring the Task Force to report by December 15, 2023, to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Nonpublic Student Bus Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {823822/1 Adopted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB486 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777
Subjects
Buses
Income Tax
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Primary Schools
Secondary Schools
Students
Tax Credits
Income Tax
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Primary Schools
Secondary Schools
Students
Tax Credits
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 757 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |