MD SB314 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-40)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-40)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of General Services to establish certain standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize the risk of bird collisions; requiring each building constructed, acquired, or substantially altered by the Department to meet certain standards related to the types of glass used and the transparency of passageways and corners to the extent practicable; requiring the Department to reduce the lighting of existing public buildings using automatic control technologies to the extent practicable; etc.
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-40) (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (25-21) (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (29-18) (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (25-21) (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (29-18) (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-40) |
2019-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {496682/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-03-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (25-21) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (29-18) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {604031/1 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {604031/1 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Birds
Conservation
Construction
Energy
Energy Matters
General Services, Department of
Landscape Architects
Natural Resources - Generally
Public Buildings and Facilities
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Time
Weights and Measures
Conservation
Construction
Energy
Energy Matters
General Services, Department of
Landscape Architects
Natural Resources - Generally
Public Buildings and Facilities
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Time
Weights and Measures