MD SB311 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program; providing for the purposes of the Corps Program; establishing a Corps Board, with specified membership, officers, duties, staff, and terms; providing for the purpose of the Corps Board; requiring the Chesapeake Bay Trust, in consultation with the Corps Board, to make grants to qualified organizations for the creation or expansion of full- and part-time Corps Programs that involve State citizens of all ages in environmental and energy conservation projects; etc.
Title
Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. George Della [D] |
Sen. Roy Dyson [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Exum [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Thomas Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (110-27) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-18 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (33-14) | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-15 | Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Floor Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2010-03-12 | Laid Over (Senator Edwards) Adopted | |
2010-03-12 | Floor Committee Amendment | |
2010-03-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-11 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/16 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Chesapeake Bay
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Education
Elderly Persons
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Environmental Trust
Exemptions
Grants
Higher Education
Job Training
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Alternative Energy Sources
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Chesapeake Bay
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Education
Elderly Persons
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Environmental Trust
Exemptions
Grants
Higher Education
Job Training
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth