MD SB305 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Geological Survey Fund to finance certain direct and indirect costs, including long-term budgeting and planning for survey projects, procurements, and equipment purchases; establishing the Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund in the Department of Natural Resources; and requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund.
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Maryland Geological Survey Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-01 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-09-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB117 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Equipment
Geological Survey, Maryland
Gifts
Interest
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Procurement
Public Officials
Revenue and Taxes
Surveyors
Treasurers
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Equipment
Geological Survey, Maryland
Gifts
Interest
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Procurement
Public Officials
Revenue and Taxes
Surveyors
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 1 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 2 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 2 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |