MD SB300 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an individualized education program to include a learning continuity plan to be implemented for students with disabilities for certain purposes during emergency conditions beginning October 1, 2021; requiring an individualized education program team to develop a learning continuity plan at certain times; requiring an individualized education team, within 10 days after a determination that emergency conditions exist, to notify certain parents or guardians that a learning continuity plan is in place; etc.
Title
Special Education – Learning Continuity Plan – Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-0) |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {304631/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB714 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Subjects
Curriculum
Disabilities
Education
Emergencies
Equipment
Fire Protection
Flood Control
Governor
Highways
internet
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
pandemics
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Remote and Hybrid Education
Safety
Special Education
Strikes
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Transportation
Disabilities
Education
Emergencies
Equipment
Fire Protection
Flood Control
Governor
Highways
internet
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
pandemics
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Remote and Hybrid Education
Safety
Special Education
Strikes
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Transportation