MD HB714 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an individualized education program to include a learning continuity plan to be implemented for students with disabilities during emergency conditions beginning October 1, 2021; requiring an individualized education program team to develop a learning continuity plan; requiring, within 10 days after a determination that emergency conditions exist, a certain team to attempt to notify the parents or guardian of a certain child that a learning continuity plan is in place; etc.
Title
Special Education - Learning Continuity Plan - Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214 |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2021-04-12 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {704430/1 Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | House | Substitute Committee Amendment {515063/1 Adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {945560/1 Withdrawn |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion Special Order until 03/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {945560/1 |
2021-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB300 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Subjects
Curriculum
Disabilities
Education
Emergencies
Equipment
Fire Protection
Flood Control
Governor
Highways
internet
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
pandemics
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Remote and Hybrid Education
Safety
Special Education
Strikes
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Transportation
Disabilities
Education
Emergencies
Equipment
Fire Protection
Flood Control
Governor
Highways
internet
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
pandemics
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Remote and Hybrid Education
Safety
Special Education
Strikes
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Transportation