MD SB299 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of General Services to establish and periodically update certain standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize adverse impacts on birds; requiring each State building constructed, acquired, or substantially altered by the State to meet the standards to the extent practicable and within budgetary constraints; requiring the Department to reduce the lighting of existing State buildings in a certain manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2020)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-22SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB192 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement4101(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement4410.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback