MD SB292 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the date by which the Office of Student Financial Assistance may award an initial Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship; and extending the date by which the Office may renew a Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship under specified circumstances.
Title
Education - Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-27 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-26 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |