MD SB291 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that certain motor vehicle offenses related to following too closely do not apply to a group of individual trucks that are traveling in a unified manner with electronically coordinated speed and braking systems and are being operated in a certain manner; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to adopt certain regulations governing truck travel in a unified manner.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses – Following Too Closely – Unified Truck Travel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m. |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Disclosure
Highways
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Highways
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |