MD SB291 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Environmental Service, consistent with specified provisions of law, to recognize and deal with an employee organization once elected as an exclusive representative, to collectively bargain, and to enter into specified types of agreements applicable to specified State employees; and providing for an exception to an exemption from specified provisions of State personnel law.
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-46) (Y: 91 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {983422/3 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (49-88) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {223326/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (50-90) (Y: 50 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {223326/3 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (49-89) (Y: 49 N: 89 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {213820/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (42-94) (Y: 42 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {983422/3 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (49-88) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {223326/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (50-90) (Y: 50 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {223326/3 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (49-89) (Y: 49 N: 89 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {213820/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (42-94) (Y: 42 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-46) |
2017-03-28 | House | Floor Amendment {983422/3 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (49-88) |
2017-03-28 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate McComas) Adopted |
2017-03-28 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate McComas) Adopted |
2017-03-28 | House | Floor Amendment {223326/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (50-90) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Floor Amendment {223326/3 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (49-89) |
2017-03-24 | House | Floor Amendment {213820/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (42-94) |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Collective Bargaining
Environmental Service, Maryland
Natural Resources - Generally
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Unions
Environmental Service, Maryland
Natural Resources - Generally
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Unions