MD SB282 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 774
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 774
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from conducting or contracting for animal testing in the development of a cosmetic; prohibiting a manufacturer from selling or offering for sale in the State a cosmetic under certain circumstances beginning July 1, 2022; providing that certain provisions of the Act do not apply to certain animal testing; prohibiting a political subdivision from adopting or enforcing provisions of local law relating to animal testing on cosmetics; establishing certain penalties for certain violations of the Act; etc.
Title
Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 774 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-38) |
2021-03-25 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB611 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 773
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Animals
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Ethics
Evidence
Fines
Health
Industry and Technology
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Medical Research
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Records
Retail Sales
State's Attorneys
Animals
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Ethics
Evidence
Fines
Health
Industry and Technology
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Medical Research
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Records
Retail Sales
State's Attorneys
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 21 | 1215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 259.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |