MD SB272 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:15 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:15 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to provide, by law, a payment deferral of the county property tax for specified residential real property; requiring the governing body of Anne Arundel County to specify the duration and amounts, restrictions, and income eligibility requirements for the payment deferral; requiring the payment of the deferred property taxes under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Payment Deferral - Amounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:15 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Exemptions
Housing
Interest
Land Records
Liens
Notices
Property Tax
Real Property
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Exemptions
Housing
Interest
Land Records
Liens
Notices
Property Tax
Real Property
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0272.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0272f.pdf |