MD SB258 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a real estate investment trust to establish its name in a certain manner and have an office in this State and a resident agent; providing for the formation, organization, registration, operation, and termination of foreign real estate investment trusts; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to register a foreign real estate investment trust in a certain manner; authorizing, under certain circumstances, a foreign real estate investment trust to do business in this State; etc.
Title
Real Estate Investment Trust Modernization Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Attorney General
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Corporations and Associations
Disclosure
Estates and Trusts
Fines
Foreign Ownership
Forfeiture
Interstate Affairs
Investments
Jurisdiction
Mergers and Acquisitions
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Estate
Records
Registration
Residency
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Attorney General
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Corporations and Associations
Disclosure
Estates and Trusts
Fines
Foreign Ownership
Forfeiture
Interstate Affairs
Investments
Jurisdiction
Mergers and Acquisitions
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Estate
Records
Registration
Residency