MD SB258 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the provision of law prohibiting in Carroll County the issuance of a permit authorizing the operation of a gaming event after 1 a.m. on Sunday.
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {285363/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |