MD SB258 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to withhold 20% of the earnings of an inmate in the Private Sector/Prison Industry Enhancement Certification Program of the U.S. Department of Justice, Bureau of Justice Assistance for compensation for victims of crime; requiring the Department to allocate earnings that are withheld in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-22 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {328970/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {328970/1 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attachments and Garnishments
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Parole and Probation
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Parole and Probation
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment