MD SB255 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB757

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: Feb 10 @ 1:00 pm Senate Finance Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that, within the Office of the Public Defender, the deputy public defender, district public defenders, and assistant public defenders are placed in certain employment categories in the State Personnel Management System; altering certain provisions of law regarding personnel actions within the Office that relate to the hiring, discipline, and termination of employees; providing that employees of the Office are subject to collective bargaining under the State Personnel Management System; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel Management System – Office of the Public Defender – Placement and Collective Bargaining

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-20SenateHearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-14SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB90 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
SB757 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure16203(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions12102(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3101(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3102(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3205(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback