MD SB251 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the deadline by which a certificate of candidacy for an office to be filled by a special election is required to be filed; establishing the filing deadline for a certificate of candidacy for a special election of a write-in candidate; providing that a certain individual may not file a certificate of candidacy if there are 64 days or fewer before the date of the election; establishing a filing deadline for a certificate of nomination; providing that a certain judicial review be sought by a certain date; etc.
Title
Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-01-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-01-30 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-0) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {794437/1 Adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Ballots
Boundaries
Campaign Financing
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Disclosure
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Governor
Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Judicial Review
Names
Petitions
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Political Parties
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Safety
Signatures
Sunset
Time
Voting
Boundaries
Campaign Financing
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Disclosure
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Governor
Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Judicial Review
Names
Petitions
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Political Parties
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Safety
Signatures
Sunset
Time
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 11 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 5 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 5 | 703.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 6 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 9 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |