MD SB249 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland individual and corporate income tax for the fair market value of any rental agreements for equipment provided at no cost to and accepted by specified entities under specified circumstances; providing that the subtraction may not exceed $5,000 for any taxable year; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Donation of Rented Equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |