MD SB237 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Correctional Education Council, in collaboration with the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning and the Director of Education and Workforce Skills Training for Correctional Institutions in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, to develop and implement, on or before July 1, 2019, a financial literacy and entrepreneurship pilot program with curriculum to be offered as part of certain transition training to certain inmates in the Division of Correction; etc.
Title
Adult Correctional Institutions – Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2018-03-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {807775/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Correction, Division of
Correctional Institutions
Curriculum
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
State Universities and Colleges
Committees and Commissions
Correction, Division of
Correctional Institutions
Curriculum
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
State Universities and Colleges