MD SB236 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB656
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the CAM for Veterans Grant Program to provide grants to veterans suffering from post-traumatic stress disorder, anxiety, depression, or stress for financial assistance to obtain complementary and alternative medicine(CAM); requiring the Maryland Veterans Trust to implement and administer the Program; requiring the Trust to expend money from the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund to provide grants for the Program; and requiring the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to adopt certain regulations.
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB656 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Subjects
Armed Forces
Estates and Trusts
Grants
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Welfare
Estates and Trusts
Grants
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Welfare
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 913 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 914.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 914.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0236?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0236f.pdf |