MD SB235 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, except under certain circumstances, the State minimum wage rate in effect for certain periods of time based on annual growth in a certain Consumer Price Index; and requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry, beginning March 1, 2019, to annually determine and announce the growth in the Consumer Price Index, if any, and the new State minimum wage rate.
Title
Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage - Indexing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Price Index
Labor and Industry, Division of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Personnel
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Consumer Price Index
Labor and Industry, Division of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Personnel
Time
Work, Labor and Employment