MD SB234 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Entering into the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact; providing the purpose of the Compact is to strengthen access to health care by developing a process to complement existing licensing and provide a streamlined method to allow physicians to become licensed in multiple states; requiring the State Board of Physicians to set fees for issuance and renewal of licenses under the Compact; requiring a compact physician to submit certain information to the Board within 30 days after receiving the request from the Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {846481/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-28HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-15HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {834932/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-01-31SenateHearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-01-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0234&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0234f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0234t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0234e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_470_sb0234e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0234_83493201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0234_84648101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0016.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0234.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0234_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0544.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0234_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1249.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1392.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback