MD SB225 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a county board of education and authorizing a nonpublic school, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, to require two school employees to be trained in recognizing the signs and symptoms of a seizure, administering first aid, and administering or assisting with the administration of seizure medication and performing manual vagus nerve stimulation; authorizing a certain registered nurse to serve as a certain trained school employee; providing a certain employee is immune from civil liability under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-06SenateHearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
2021-01-06SenateHearing canceled
2020-12-29SenateHearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-08-26SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB370 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7447(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback