MD HB370 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB675
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county board of education and authorizing a nonpublic school, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, to require two school employees to be trained in recognizing the signs and symptoms of a seizure, administering first aid, and administering or assisting with the administration of seizure medication and performing manual vagus nerve stimulation; authorizing a certain registered nurse to serve as a certain trained school employee; providing a certain employee is immune from civil liability under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
Sponsors
Del. Ken Kerr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations |
2020-08-26 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB225 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
HB675 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
HB675 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Subjects
Age
Contractors
Counselors
Drugs
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Health
Job Training
Labeling
Liability
Local Government Mandates
Medical Conditions
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Students
Teachers
Volunteers
Contractors
Counselors
Drugs
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Health
Job Training
Labeling
Liability
Local Government Mandates
Medical Conditions
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Students
Teachers
Volunteers
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0370?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0370f.pdf |