MD SB219 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to hunt turkey on private property on Sundays during the spring turkey hunting season in Carroll County; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Carroll County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-5) (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-5) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Birds
Blue Laws
Carroll County
Emergency Bills
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Real Property
Blue Laws
Carroll County
Emergency Bills
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Real Property