MD SB211 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum total amount of research and development tax credits that the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce may approve; and applying the Act to all Maryland research and development tax credits certified after December 15, 2015.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {879530/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |