MD SB208 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person who is not a certain licensee may not complete a sale, rental, or transfer of a certain rifle or shotgun as a purchaser, lessee, or transferee or seller, lessor, or transferor, except under certain circumstances; requiring, before a certain sale, rental, or transfer is conducted, the seller, lessor, or transferor and purchaser, lessee, or transferee to both request that a certain licensee facilitate the sale, rental, or transfer; establishing certain penalties for violations of the Act; etc.
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, and Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-42) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {273624/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {833929/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {553924/2 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment {398179/2 Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {398179/2 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {398179/2 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {398179/2 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Dealers
Estates and Trusts
Ex-Offenders
Fees
Fraud
Gifts
Guns
Identification
Leases and Rent
Liability
Licenses
Loans
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Protection Orders
Public Safety
Substance Abuse
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Dealers
Estates and Trusts
Ex-Offenders
Fees
Fraud
Gifts
Guns
Identification
Leases and Rent
Liability
Licenses
Loans
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Protection Orders
Public Safety
Substance Abuse
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 5 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 204.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |