MD HB4 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a person who is not a certain licensee may not complete the sale, rental, or transfer of a certain rifle or shotgun as a purchaser, lesse, or transferee, except under certain circumstances; requiring, before a certain sale, rental, or transfer is conducted, the seller, lessor, or transferor and purchaser, lessee, or transferee to request that a certain licensee facilitate the sale, rental, or transfer; authorizing a seller, lessor, or transferor to deliver a rifle or shotgun in a certain manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, and Transfers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - Floor Amendment 883824/1 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-31 - House - Floor Amendment 813526/1 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (Y: 47 N: 88 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-31 - House - Floor Amendment 573928/1 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (Y: 45 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - House - Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - Floor Amendment 763024/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (Y: 47 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - House - Floor Amendment 393927/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 48 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-16HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (87-43)
2020-03-16HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-16HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
2020-03-16HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-09SenateThird Reading Passed (31-14)
2020-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-05SenateFloor Amendment {123227/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted
2020-03-05SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
2020-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {638976/2 Adopted
2020-03-04SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
2020-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {638976/2
2020-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-05SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-04HouseThird Reading Passed (87-47)
2020-01-31HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-01-31HouseFloor Amendment {883824/1 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (44-92)
2020-01-31HouseFloor Amendment {813526/1 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (47-88)
2020-01-31HouseFloor Amendment {573928/1 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (45-91)
2020-01-31HouseFloor Amendment {843724/1 (Delegate Mautz) Withdrawn
2020-01-31HouseFloor Committee Amendment {512011/1 Adopted
2020-01-31HouseFloor Amendment {723126/1 (Delegate Mautz) Withdrawn
2020-01-30HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2020-01-30HouseFloor Amendment {723126/1 (Delegate Mautz)
2020-01-30HouseFloor Amendment {153420/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn
2020-01-29HouseMotion Laid Over (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
2020-01-29HouseFloor Amendment {153420/1 (Delegate Szeliga)
2020-01-29HouseDecision of the Chair upheld (96-42)
2020-01-29HouseAppeal of the decision of the Chair (Delegate Kipke)
2020-01-29HouseRuled Out Of Order
2020-01-29HouseFloor Amendment {453922/1 (Delegate Buckel)
2020-01-29HouseFloor Amendment {763024/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-93)
2020-01-29HouseFloor Amendment {393927/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (48-92)
2020-01-28HouseMotion Special Order until 1/29 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2020-01-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {182311/1 Adopted
2020-01-27HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-01-07HouseHearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-09-04HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB208 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety5201(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5204.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5207(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0004?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0004f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0004t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0004e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_18231101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_39392701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_76302401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_45392201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_15342001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_72312601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_51201101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_84372401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_57392801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_81352601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_88382401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_63897602.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0004_12322701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/hb0004_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/hb0004_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0041.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0042.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0043.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0067.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0068.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0069.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0078.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0537.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0892.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback