MD SB203 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB711
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the property owners that the Department of Natural Resources is required to notify of applications for certain aquaculture leases to be issued in the Chesapeake Bay or the Atlantic Coastal Bays; requiring the Department to work with a certain petitioner and a certain applicant to mitigate certain concerns and to consider conflict resolution between shoreline property owners and aquaculture lease applicants before issuing a lease; etc.
Title
Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notices, Protests, Meetings, and Conflict Resolution
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB711 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Aquaculture
Health
Hunting and Fishing
Leases and Rent
meetings
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Information
Real Property
Safety
Health
Hunting and Fishing
Leases and Rent
meetings
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Information
Real Property
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 4 | 11A-09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0203?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0203f.pdf |