MD SB202 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB817

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering, from 15 years to 20 years, the time period that certain inmates sentenced to life imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 2021, must serve before becoming eligible for parole consideration; repealing certain provisions that provide that inmates serving a term of life imprisonment may be paroled only with the Governor's approval, subject to certain provisions; requiring a Maryland Parole Commission panel to determine by a vote of six of the members whether a certain inmate is suitable for parole; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 88 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 90 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Floor Amendment 623521/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Floor Amendment 493329/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Floor Amendment 283228/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 19 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (88-50)
2021-04-12HouseConference Committee Report {293524/1 Adopted
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (30-17)
2021-04-12SenateConference Committee Report {293524/1 Adopted
2021-04-12SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2021-04-12SenateConference Committee Report {293524/1
2021-04-05SenateHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Williams and Malone)
2021-04-05SenateHouse Refuses Recede
2021-04-05HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Williams and Malone)
2021-04-05HouseHouse Refuses Recede
2021-04-05HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Waldstreicher and Hough)
2021-04-05HouseSenate Requests House Recede
2021-04-05HouseSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2021-04-02SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Waldstreicher and Hough)
2021-04-02SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2021-04-02SenateSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2021-03-30HouseThird Reading Passed (90-45)
2021-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments {702811/1 Adopted
2021-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2021-03-25HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-25HouseHearing canceled
2021-03-23HouseHearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-22HouseReferred Judiciary
2021-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed (31-16)
2021-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-19SenateFloor Amendment {623521/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (19-28)
2021-03-19SenateFloor Amendment {493329/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (19-28)
2021-03-19SenateFloor Amendment {283228/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (19-27)
2021-03-19SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
2021-03-19SenateFloor Amendment {283228/1 (Senator Ready)
2021-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {328975/1 Adopted
2021-03-18SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Carter) Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {328975/1
2021-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-02SenateHearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-02SenateHearing canceled
2020-12-28SenateHearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2020-08-20SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB817 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Correctional Services4305(n/a)See Bill Text
Correctional Services7301(n/a)See Bill Text
Correctional Services7307(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0202?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0202f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0202t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0202e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0202_32897501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0202_28322801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0202_49332901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0202_62352101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0202_70281101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0202_29352401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0202_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0202_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0532.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0533.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0534.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0654.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0867.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1485.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1189.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback