MD SB199 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Transit Administration and a county or municipality to activate, under specified conditions, audio recording devices installed on transit service vehicles; providing that specified audio recording devices be capable of automatic activation in the event of an accident or other public safety incident requiring documentation; providing that a specified recording may be made available only for specified purposes; requiring specified annual reports to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsors
Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Sen. Robert Zirkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Substitute Committee Amendment {518478/1 Adopted |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Motion Withdrawn Committee Amendment (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {908774/1 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {908774/1 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {908774/1 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Benson) Adopted |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {908774/1 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {908774/1 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative Agencies
Buses
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Investigations and Inquiries
Mass Transit
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Recordings
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Administrative Agencies
Buses
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Investigations and Inquiries
Mass Transit
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Recordings
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Transportation
Transportation - Generally