MD SB197 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain units of State government from waiving certain minority business enterprise goals for emergency or expedited procurement contracts or contracts for the purchase of commodities.
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Participation Goals - Waiver
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0197?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0197f.pdf |