MD SB196 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the termination date for certain provisions of law requiring the Secretary of Health to examine and report on fatal overdoses involving opioids and other controlled substances; and altering the requirements relating to the examination and report.
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Overdose Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Data
Death
Drugs
Examinations
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Records
Reports
Safety
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Death
Drugs
Examinations
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Records
Reports
Safety
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 5 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |