MD SB195 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a specified unit of a State facility may admit a minor under a specified provision of law for the treatment of a mental disorder to allow for the assent to the admission to be made by a psychiatric nurse practitioner and a physician; altering the requirement that a certificate accompany an application for involuntary admission to a facility or Veterans' Administration hospital under specified provisions of law to allow for a psychiatric nurse practitioner to complete a certificate; etc.
Title
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Assent and Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2015-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Health Occupations
Licenses
Mental Health
Minors
Nurses
Patients
Physicians
Public Health
State Hospitals
Veterans
Licenses
Mental Health
Minors
Nurses
Patients
Physicians
Public Health
State Hospitals
Veterans