MD SB192 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing collective bargaining rights to certain supervisory State employees; and requiring that certain supervisory State employees who are not confidential employees have separate bargaining units.
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Supervisory Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (107-28) |
2024-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-10) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/20 (Senator Gallion) Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-10-06 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB260 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Subjects
Collective Bargaining
Managers and Supervisors
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor, and Employment
Managers and Supervisors
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |