MD SB192 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the termination date for certain provisions of law concerning the Minority Business Enterprise Program; and altering the date by which the final report on a certain study of the Minority Business Enterprise Program is required to be submitted to the Legislative Policy Committee of the General Assembly to before September 30, 2023, so that the General Assembly may review the report before the 2024 Session.
Title
State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-3) |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Ethics
General Assembly
Minorities
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Ethics
General Assembly
Minorities
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |