MD SB190 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement agency that receives a certain request for a wellness check of an individual to conduct a wellness check of the individual within a reasonable amount of time after receiving the request under certain circumstances.
Title
Law Enforcement - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {803723/1 Adopted |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {413927/1 Adopted |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-09-26 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB404 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 743
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 531 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |