MD SB186 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law regarding funds and rebates related to the Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program; establishing the Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program Fund to support the administration, operation, and activities of the Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program; requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to deposit certain rebates into a certain account and to use the account to fund State-identified priorities for HIV prevention, surveillance, and care services.
Title
Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {353529/1 Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 2 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |